Case: 02-21-00034-CV
02-21-00034-CV
02/12/2021
Permissive Appeal and or Petition for Permissive Appeal
D. Alan Meeker and CQuentia NGS, LLC
Kenneth Woods and Paragon Principal, LLC
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
02/12/2021 | Petition for Permissive Appeal filed | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/09/2021 | Petition for review filed in Supreme Court | | |||||
03/18/2021 | Case stored | | |||||
02/26/2021 | Memorandum opinion issued | Motion or Writ Denied |
| ||||
02/25/2021 | Submitted | | |||||
02/23/2021 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
02/22/2021 | Response filed |
| |||||
02/12/2021 | Petition for Permissive Appeal filed |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/18/2021 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Meeker, D. Alan | Appellant | Bill N. Warren W. Chase Medling |
Woods, Kenneth | Appellee | Ryan Caughey |
Paragon Principal, LLC | Appellee | Ryan Caughey |
CQuentia NGS, LLC | Appellant | Bill N. Warren W. Chase Medling |
Trial Court Information
153rd District Court
Tarrant
Honorable Susan H. McCoy
153-304006-18
Court Reporter, 153rd District Court