judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-243
B-243
05/02/1967
Application for Writ of Error
BETSY ANN MUETH MANG, ET AL.
TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
06/29/1967Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/23/1967Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/09/1967Response to PetitionRespondent
05/02/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
07/03/1967Response to Motion filed
06/29/1967Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/23/1967Reply to Response
05/09/1967Response to Petition
05/02/1967Application for Writ of Error - FiledRefused
05/02/1967Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Betsy Ann Mueth Mang, et al.Petitioner
TRAVELERS INSURANCE COMPANYRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information