judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

STATE VS. LEMLER (MARK DANIEL)

Case Information: 33371
Short Caption:STATE VS. LEMLER (MARK DANIEL)Court:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Elko Co. - Fourth Judicial District - 7283Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/19/1998Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
11/19/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 98-00122
12/07/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 98-00273
12/07/1998AppendixFiled Appendix. 98-00274
12/21/1998Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 98-00461
12/29/1998Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Show Cause. Response due: appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order to show cause why this appeal should not be dismissed. 98-00542
01/20/1999MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Brief in Response to Order to Show Cause. 99-00387
05/25/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. Judgment: "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99A-WM/DA/NB 99-04300
06/22/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-05424
06/22/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/28/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 24, 1999. 99-05424