Case: 21-0171
21-0171
02/17/2021
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
PRESTON MARSHALL
ELAINE T. MARSHALL AND E. PIERCE MARSHALL JR.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/07/2021 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Preston Marshall. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/08/2021 | Call received | Call received from counsel for respondent verifying receipt of Petition for Review. | | |||||
04/07/2021 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review filed on behalf of Preston Marshall. |
| |||||
02/18/2021 | Electronic communication received from Party | Email received from counsel for Petitioner regarding related case. | | |||||
02/17/2021 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review granted. Petition for Review due April 7, 2021. |
| ||||
02/17/2021 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Preston Marshall. |
| |||||
02/17/2021 | Clerk's Record | | | |||||
02/17/2021 | Supplement to Clerk's/Reporter's Record | | | |||||
02/17/2021 | Court reporter/recorder's record | | | |||||
02/17/2021 | Supplement to Clerk's/Reporter's Record | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
05/07/2021 | Response | response due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Marshall, Junior, E. Pierce | Respondent | Mr. David Coale Mr. Bryce L. Callahan Mr. Christopher John Akin Mr. R. Paul Yetter Mr. Reagan W. Simpson Mr. Russell S. Post Mr. Gus G. Tamborello |
Marshall, Elaine T. | Respondent | Mr. Lennon C. Wright Mr. David Coale Mr. Gus G. Tamborello Mr. Christopher John Akin Mr. Russell S. Post Mr. Jeffrey M. Golub Ms. Sara Chelette Matthew Scorcio John Adams Mr. Kent Krabill Mr. John S. Adcock Mr. Reagan W. Simpson Mr. R. Paul Yetter Mr. John T. Cox III Mr. Bryce L. Callahan Mr. Michael Davis Mr. Jason Bradley Ostrom |
Marshall, Preston | Petitioner | Mr. Jeffrey W. Chambers Sylvanus Polky Ms. Kathleen Tanner Beduze Mr. Max L. Tribble Jr. Mr. Neal S. Manne Mr. Thomas R. Phillips Armstead Lewis Ms. Sarah Elizabeth Patel Mr. Scott A. Brister John Lahad Mr. Shawn D. Blackburn Mr. Steven J. Kherkher |
Court of Appeals Information:
Aff/Pt and Rev & Rem/Pt
___ SW3d ___,01-21-21
14th Court of Appeals
Honorable Kenneth Price Wise
Trial Court Information
Probate Court No 4
Harris
Honorable Christine Butts
365,053-401