Case: 02-20-00113-CV
02-20-00113-CV
04/09/2020
Election contest/appeal - Regular appeal
Steven Denny
The Honorable Lawrence M. 'Larry' Doss, Justice, 7th Court of Appeals, Place 4
No
7th Court of Appeals
04/09/2020
07-20-00104-CV
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/17/2020 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellee |
| ||||
04/17/2020 | Appendix filed | Appellant |
| ||||
04/13/2020 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/21/2020 | Mandate issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
04/30/2020 | Memorandum opinion issued | Affirmed |
| ||||||
04/23/2020 | Submitted | | |||||||
04/21/2020 | Motion disposed | Item is Moot | | ||||||
04/21/2020 | Set for submission on briefs - oral argument denied |
| |||||||
04/20/2020 | Motion filed |
| |||||||
04/20/2020 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
04/17/2020 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||||
04/17/2020 | Appendix filed |
| |||||||
04/13/2020 | Corrected brief requested |
| |||||||
04/13/2020 | Electronic brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||||
04/13/2020 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||||
04/13/2020 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||||
04/09/2020 | Case transferred to this court from another court of appeals | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
04/09/2020 | Letter issued by the court | | |||||||
04/09/2020 | Fee paid | | |||||||
04/09/2020 | Case transferred from this court to another court of appeals | | |||||||
04/07/2020 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||||
04/07/2020 | Fee requested | | |||||||
04/07/2020 | Order entered |
| |||||||
04/07/2020 | Docketing statement requested | | |||||||
04/06/2020 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||||
04/06/2020 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||||
04/01/2020 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/21/2020 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Denny, Steven M. | Appellant | Steven M. Denny |
Doss, Lawrence M. | Appellee | Eric Opiela |
Trial Court Information
251st District Court
Potter
Honorable W. Stacy Trotter
109,616-C-CV
Cindy Nelson