judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

KEDIST HIRPASSA V. HOWARD UNIVERSITY

Case Information: 10-CV-1086
Short Caption:KEDIST HIRPASSA V. HOWARD UNIVERSITYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CAB904-10Filed Date:08/25/2010

Opening Event Date:08/25/2010Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:09/23/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:11/04/2010
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantKedist Hirpassa YPro SeN
AppelleeHoward UniversityN
Marvelle Hall-Mcintyre NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/25/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/23/2010RECORD COPIES (10-CV-1086) (In room 115A Shelf D4)
09/23/2010RECORD INDEX (10-CV-1086)
09/23/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/13/2010 On consideration of the NOA and it appearing that appellant has appealed from the denial of a motion to reopen her case soley to amend the caption, an order this court has deemed NON-APPEALABLE in several other cases involving appellant, it is ORDERED, SS, that THIS APPEL IS HEREBY DISMISSED AS HAVING BEEN TAKEN FROM A NON-APPEALBLE ORDER. (RDPRTE) (jl)
10/13/2010DISMISSED
11/04/2010MANDATE ISSUED
04/17/2014FiledArchived