judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

GOFFI VS. CORRAO

Case Information: 38195
Short Caption:GOFFI VS. CORRAOCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Nye Co. - Fifth Judicial District - CV15850Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:07/27/2001 / Kaufman, JerrySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/19/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Nye County Clerk--check no. 1427.
07/19/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-12299
07/19/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
07/27/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Jerry J. Kaufman. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
07/27/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: 7/24/01. 01-12753
08/01/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Jerry J. Kaufman.
08/03/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 01-13189
08/06/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-13205
08/07/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Jerry J. Kaufman.
08/16/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. --Certificate of Facsimile for Motion for Extension of Time to File Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. 01-13934
08/22/2001MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. Motion for An Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss. 01-14208
08/22/2001MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Appellant's "Motion for An Extension of Time to File an Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal." 01-14209
10/24/2001Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. 01-17929
10/24/2001Settlement Program Motion/StipulationFiled Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. 01-17930
10/24/2001Settlement AgreementFiled Settlement Agreement. 01-17931
11/20/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, ' . . . this appeal is dismissed.' The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b). fn1[Respondents' August 3, 2001 motion to dismiss and Appellant's August 22, 2001 motion to extend time are denied as moot.] SNP/CLK 01-19428
11/20/2001Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.