judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DALLAS C. JOHNSON, ARLA JOHNSON, DALMAC HOMES, INCORPORATED, AAA LAZY D LAND COMPANY, LLC, and AAA LAZY D ENTERPRISES v. TRACY L. RINGOLSBY, JR., and JANE E. SWANHORST

Case Heading (S-07-0211)
Case Number:S-07-0211Case Docketed On:09/12/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:First Judicial District Laramie CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:DALLAS C. JOHNSON, ARLA JOHNSON, DALMAC HOMES, INCORPORATED, AAA LAZY D LAND COMPANY, LLC, and AAA LAZY D ENTERPRISES v. TRACY L. RINGOLSBY, JR., and JANE E. SWANHORST
Full Title:DALLAS C. JOHNSON, ARLA JOHNSON, DALMAC HOMES, INCORPORATED, AAA LAZY D LAND COMPANY, LLC, and AAA LAZY D ENTERPRISES, INCORPORATED, Appellants (Defendants), v. TRACY L. RINGOLSBY, JR., and JANE E. SWANHORST, Appellees (Plaintiffs).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantDallas C. JohnsonJames R. Salisbury
Don W. Riske
AppellantArla JohnsonJames R. Salisbury
Don W. Riske
AppellantDalmac Homes, IncorporatedJames R. Salisbury
Don W. Riske
AppellantAAA Lazy D Land Company, LLCJames R. Salisbury
Don W. Riske
AppellantAAA Lazy D Enterprises IncorporatedJames R. Salisbury
Don W. Riske
AppelleeTracy L. Ringolsby Jr.Jack John B. Speight
Robert Thomas McCue
Patrick J. Crank
AppelleeJane E. SwanhorstJack John B. Speight
Robert Thomas McCue
Patrick J. Crank

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
09/12/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
09/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
09/12/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
09/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
09/18/2007Motion - Remand to district court for entry of final order or, in the alternative, motion for an order requiring appellants to post supersedeas bondMotionRemand to district courtFinal
09/27/2007Response/Objection - Motion. Appellant's response and objection to Appellees' motion for remand to the district court for entry of final order or, in the alternative, motion for an order requiring appellants to post a supersedeas bond.Response/ObjectionMotionFinal
10/05/2007Notice-Internal - Recusal memo from Justice BurkeNotice-InternalRecusal memoFinal
10/09/2007Order - Stay proceeding. Order denying motion for remand; order denying motion for an order requiring appellants to post a supersedeas bond; and order staying appeal pending the district court's determination of motion for costs, expenses,and attorney fees.OrderStay proceedingFinal
11/08/2007System - Status check - other - contacted counsel for appellant - secretary will call district court and check to see when an order on attorneys' fees might be entered.SystemStatus check - otherFinal
11/28/2007Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
11/28/2007Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
11/28/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal