judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 6th Court Of Appeals

Case: 06-96-00094-CV
06-96-00094-CV
10/21/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Casa Ford, Inc. and North River Insurance Company, and Casa Ford, Inc. and Western Alliance Insurance Company
Ford Motor Company
No
14th Court of Appeals
11/06/1996
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/24/2006Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
01/27/1999Mandate Issued
11/12/1998Case Returned from Higher Ct.
10/01/1998Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/01/1998Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
06/15/1998Amended Motion for RehearingMotion or Writ Granted
06/15/1998Amended Motion for Rehearing
06/11/1998Mot to Ext Time File Rehearing
06/11/1998Mot-Ext to File Rehear Disp
05/21/1998PETITION FOR REVIEW DISPOSED BY SUPREME COURTMotion or Writ Denied
05/21/1998PETITION FOR REVIEW DISPOSED BY SUPREME COURTMotion or Writ Denied
04/20/1998Case Forwarded to Higher Court
12/22/1997Petition for Review Filed in Supreme Court
11/24/1997Petition for Review Filed in Supreme Court
10/07/1997Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/07/1997Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
10/07/1997Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
09/04/1997Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/04/1997Motion for Rehearing Filed
09/02/1997Motion for Rehearing Filed
08/15/1997Opinion issuedAff/Rev & Remanded to Trial Ct
07/24/1997Submitted
07/24/1997Submission
07/21/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/21/1997MOTION FILED
07/21/1997Supplemental Brief Filed
07/01/1997Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/01/1997No Description Available.
06/25/1997Case ready to be set
06/25/1997MOTION FILED
06/25/1997Brief Filed
06/25/1997No Description Available.
06/25/1997Request for Oral Argument
06/24/1997Motion to File DispMotion or Writ Granted
06/24/1997Motion to File DispMotion or Writ Granted
06/23/1997Submission
06/19/1997Motion for leave to file
06/16/1997Motion for leave to file
06/10/1997Motion to File DispMotion or Writ Granted
06/04/1997Motion for leave to file
05/19/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/19/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/02/1997Motion to File DispMotion or Writ Granted
03/27/1997No Description Available.
03/27/1997Holding for Record
03/27/1997Motion for leave to file
03/25/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/24/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/19/1997Brief Filed
03/19/1997Request for Oral Argument
03/18/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Dismissed as Moot
03/14/1997Brief Filed
03/14/1997Request for Oral Argument
03/12/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/06/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/04/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/03/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/27/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/04/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/30/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
01/22/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/17/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/27/1996Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/27/1996Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/10/1996Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/10/1996Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/22/1996Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
11/22/1996Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/22/1996Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
11/21/1996Transcript Filed
11/20/1996Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/20/1996Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/06/1996
11/01/1996Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsMotion or Writ Granted
09/26/1996Statement of Facts Filed
09/26/1996Holding for Record
08/27/1996Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
08/06/1996Appeal Bond Filed
06/24/1996Judgment signed in trial court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/27/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
North River Ins. & Casa FordAppellantHon. Jimmy Williamson
Hon. Scott BristerJUDGEScott A. Brister
Charles BacarisseTrial court clerkMr. Charles Bacarisse
Western Alliance & Casa FordAppellantHon. Nicholas E. Zito
Hon. Randall D. Wilkins
Ford Motor CompanyAppelleeHon. Michael L. Calhoon
Hon. Michael S. Goldberg
Hon. Claudia Wilson Frost
Hon. Jacalyn A. Hollabaugh
Trial Court Information
234th District Court
Harris
Honorable Scott A. Brister
93-60338