Case: 20-0285
20-0285
04/09/2020
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
KHOSROW SADEGHIAN
DAVID JACO
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/28/2020 | Motion for Rehearing | Rehearing filed in Petition for Review | Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Khosrow Sadeghian. |
| ||||
11/10/2020 | Reply Brief | Petitioner | Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Khosrow Sadeghian. | |||||
11/02/2020 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent | Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of David Jaco. | |||||
10/14/2020 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Received (instead of filed) | Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Civil Justice League submitted by George S. Christian of Austin, Texas. |
| ||||
09/28/2020 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner | Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Khosrow Sadeghian. | |||||
08/10/2020 | Reply to Response | Petitioner | Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Khosrow Sadeghian. | |||||
07/27/2020 | Response to Petition | Respondent | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of David Jaco. | |||||
05/14/2020 | Corrected Petition | Petitioner | Corrected Petition for Review of petition originally filed on May 13, 2020, filed on behalf of Khosrow Sadeghian. | |||||
05/13/2020 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | Petition for Review of petition filed on behalf of Khosrow Sadeghian. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/29/2021 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | |
| |||||
01/29/2021 | Motion for Rehearing - Disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
12/29/2020 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
12/28/2020 | Motion for Rehearing | Motion for Rehearing filed on behalf of Khosrow Sadeghian. |
| |||||
12/11/2020 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | |
| ||||
11/10/2020 | Reply Brief | Reply Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Khosrow Sadeghian. | ||||||
11/02/2020 | Brief on the Merits | Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of David Jaco. | ||||||
10/14/2020 | Amicus Curiae Brief received | Amicus Curiae Brief of Texas Civil Justice League submitted by George S. Christian of Austin, Texas. |
| |||||
10/13/2020 | Motion for Extension of Time disposed. | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits granted. Further requests for extensions of time will be disfavored. Respondent's brief is due no later than November 2, 2020; and Reply brief is due November 17, 2020. |
| ||||
10/12/2020 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief filed | Motion for Extension of Time to file Respondent's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of David Jaco. | ||||||
09/29/2020 | Call received | Call received from counsel for petitioner regarding brief on the merits. | | |||||
09/28/2020 | Brief on the Merits | Petitioner's Brief on the Merits filed on behalf of Khosrow Sadeghian. | ||||||
08/28/2020 | Brief on the Merits Requested | Brief on the Merits requested: Petitioner's brief on the merits due no later than September 28, 2020; Response brief due October 19, 2020; Reply brief due November 3, 2020. |
| |||||
08/10/2020 | Reply to Response | Reply to Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of Khosrow Sadeghian. | ||||||
07/27/2020 | Response to Petition | Response to Petition for Review filed on behalf of David Jaco. | ||||||
07/17/2020 | Supreme Court of Texas Requested Response | Requested response to petition for review due no later than August 17, 2020. |
| |||||
06/16/2020 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |||||
05/14/2020 | Corrected Petition | Corrected Petition for Review of petition originally filed on May 13, 2020, filed on behalf of Khosrow Sadeghian. | ||||||
05/13/2020 | Petition for Review | Petition for Review of petition filed on behalf of Khosrow Sadeghian. |
| |||||
04/10/2020 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review granted. Petition for Review due May 13, 2020. |
| ||||
04/10/2020 | Response to Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review | Response to Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf David Jaco. | ||||||
04/09/2020 | Electronic communication sent to Party | Email sent to counsel for respondent to determine if they will file a response to Motion for Extension of Time. | | |||||
04/09/2020 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to file Petition for Review filed on behalf of Khosrow Sadeghian. |
| |||||
04/09/2020 | Court reporter/recorder's record | | | |||||
04/09/2020 | Clerk's Record | | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
01/29/2021 | Case Stored | Case stored. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Texas Civil Justice League | Amicus Curiae | Mr. George Scott Christian |
Sadeghian, Khosrow | Petitioner | Mr. Brad Hogan Mr. Mark Lieberman Mr. Jason Everett Boatright Mr. Michael V. Sheetz Mr. Christopher Heald Mr. Christopher S. Quillin |
Jaco, David | Respondent | Mr. E. Z. Dubose |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-18-00838-CV
Affirmed
___ SW3d ___, 01-23-20
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable Kenneth H. Molberg
Trial Court Information
116th District Court
Dallas
Honorable Tonya Parker
DC-15-13719