Case: 14-20-00866-CV
14-20-00866-CV
12/30/2020
Injunction
Basim Mousilli
Noura Sweed
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
04/22/2021 | Motion to stay disposed | DENIED |
| ||||
04/16/2021 | Motion for temporary relief filed |
| |||||
04/07/2021 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
04/05/2021 | Letter filed |
| |||||
04/02/2021 | Reporters record due | | |||||
03/29/2021 | Response due | | |||||
03/25/2021 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
03/20/2021 | Reporters record received not filed | REFUSED |
| ||||
03/18/2021 | Reporters record received not filed | REFUSED |
| ||||
03/17/2021 | Notice of late record |
| |||||
03/12/2021 | No payment arrangements made with trial court clerk for record |
| |||||
03/11/2021 | Reporters record due | | |||||
03/11/2021 | Record due | | |||||
01/22/2021 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||
01/22/2021 | Response due | | |||||
01/15/2021 | Fee paid |
| |||||
01/14/2021 | Docketing statement due | | |||||
01/14/2021 | Mediation docketing statement due | | |||||
01/12/2021 | Past due court fee notice |
| |||||
01/11/2021 | Court fee due | | |||||
01/05/2021 | Court reporters notice to court regarding status of record |
| |||||
12/30/2020 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
12/30/2020 | Letter issued by the court |
| |||||
12/30/2020 | Case began in court of appeals |
| |||||
12/29/2020 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
12/11/2020 | Motion for new trial was filed in the trial court | | |||||
12/01/2020 | Request for findings of fact and conclusions of law | | |||||
11/11/2020 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/07/2021 | Status | Appellant brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Sweed, Noura | Appellee | Douglas Ray York Leslie Jacob |
Mousilli, Basim | Appellant | Anita F. Kawaja |
Trial Court Information
280th District Court
Harris
Honorable Judge, 280th District Court
2020-48880
Sheryl E. Stapp