Case Information: 93-CF-1000 | |||
Short Caption: | JUMA E. HANDON V. UNITED STATES | Classification: | Appeals - Criminal Felony - Drug Related |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | F14201-91 | Filed Date: | 08/04/1993 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 08/04/1993 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 11/10/1993 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 05/03/1994 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 10/25/1994 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 01/20/1995 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Juma E. Handon | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | United States | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
08/04/1993 | NOTICE OF APPEAL | |||
08/30/1993 | APPOINTING COUNSEL/CO REFERRAL (CJA) Betty J. Clark, Esq. | |||
09/07/1993 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT | |||
09/10/1993 | RECORD ON APPEAL | |||
09/14/1993 | APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION to amend docketing statement | |||
09/16/1993 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #1 (74 pgs. - Rust) (6/30/93 proc.) | |||
09/22/1993 | RECEIVED Exhibit A to be filed with the motion to amend docketing statement. | |||
10/20/1993 | ORDER Grant motion to amend ADS. Aplt to file new ADS within 15 days. | |||
11/10/1993 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #2 (117 pages--Wray) (6/24/93 proceedings) | |||
11/10/1993 | RECORD COMPLETED | |||
01/04/1994 | ORDER: Counsel for appellant shall, within 15 days from the date of this order, file the docketing statement, accompanied by a motion for leave to file the docketing statement out of time, setting forth good cause for the failure either to timely file the docketing statement or to request an extension of time within which to do so. Failure to comply may result in counsel's appointment being vacated. (By RO) | |||
01/24/1994 | APPELLANT'S MISCELLANEOUS PROCEDURAL MOTION -to refile docketing statement | |||
02/18/1994 | ORDER GRANTING APLT MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DS and the docketing statement is filed. (By WHN) | |||
02/18/1994 | APPELLANT'S DOCKETING STATEMENT | |||
03/29/1994 | APPELLANT'S BRIEF | |||
05/02/1994 | SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD #3 (10 pages--Moore,III) (3/17/92 proc.) | |||
05/03/1994 | APPELLEE'S BRIEF | |||
05/03/1994 | BRIEFS COMPLETED | |||
05/16/1994 | FINAL SCREENING - SUMMARY CALENDAR I | |||
10/25/1994 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
10/25/1994 | SUBMITTED (WG,FA,RE) | |||
12/29/1994 | REMANDED Opinion | |||
01/20/1995 | MANDATE ISSUED |