judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-96-01644-CR
05-96-01644-CR
10/21/1996
Other Felony
Turner, Monica Renee
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/03/1999Mandate Issued
03/03/1999Mandate Issued
02/09/1999Record Returned
01/13/1999Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
11/03/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
10/29/1998Record Shipped
10/01/1998Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
08/24/1998Ext to File Petition for Discretionary Review-CCAMotion or Writ Granted
07/03/1998Opinion issuedReformed and Affirmed
07/03/1998Opinion issuedReformed and Affirmed
05/08/1998Submitted
05/08/1998Submission
05/08/1998Submitted
05/07/1998Brief Filed
04/14/1998Submission
12/08/1997Case ready to be set
12/08/1997Case ready to be set
11/12/1997Brief Due
10/21/1997Supplemental Brief Filed
10/14/1997Letter Sent by the Court
10/13/1997Brief Filed
10/11/1997MattConv
09/11/1997MattConv
09/11/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
09/10/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
08/12/1997Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
08/12/1997Statement of Facts Filed
08/11/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
06/17/1997Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Denied
06/05/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
05/22/1997MattConv
04/16/1997MattConv
02/28/1997Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
02/25/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
02/06/1997Transcript Filed
02/04/1997MattConv
01/16/1997Record due
10/21/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/21/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/26/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
09/18/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/03/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasLisa Smith Braxton
Turner, Monica ReneeCriminal - AppellantJohn Hendrik
Trial Court Information
203rd Judicial District Court
Dallas
F96-01400-MP
10 YRS PROBATION, FINE 750