judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 12th Court Of Appeals

Case: 12-96-00328-CV
12-96-00328-CV
10/21/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Sone Energy Corp.
Ellis Exploration, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
06/12/1997Brief was not filedAppellant
04/29/1997Brief was not filedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/18/2006Case has been destroyed/Records Retention Action
10/15/1998Order EnteredOverruled
08/25/1998Higher Court DecisionMotion or Writ Denied
06/26/1998Letter from the Court
06/12/1998Order EnteredMotion or Writ Granted
06/04/1998ACKNOWLEDGMENT CARD RECEIVED FROM APPEAL COURT
06/04/1998Filing Fee Paid
06/03/1998
05/29/1998Mandate Issued
05/29/1998Case stored
05/14/1998
04/24/1998Letter from the Court
03/30/1998Motion for Rehearing DisposedOverruled
03/18/1998Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Overruled
03/16/1998motion for rehearing filed
02/27/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/19/1998Submitted
02/19/1998Submission
02/18/1998Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/18/1998Supplemental Brief Received
01/28/1998Letter to Submit w/o Argument
01/28/1998Submission
08/27/1997Disposition of MotionMotion or Writ Granted
08/06/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Overruled
08/04/1997No Description Available.
07/24/1997Brief Filed
07/24/1997Case ready to be set
07/24/1997Prescreened
07/24/1997Response to Motion Filed
07/16/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
07/15/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
07/15/1997Motion to dismiss disposedOverruled
07/09/1997Response to Motion Filed
07/03/1997Brief Received
07/03/1997Brief Filed
06/25/1997Motion to Dismiss Appeal Filed
06/23/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
06/12/1997Brief was not filed
06/06/1997Brief Due
06/03/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
05/08/1997letter filed
05/05/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/29/1997Brief was not filed
04/23/1997Brief Due
03/28/1997affidavit filed
03/24/1997
03/24/1997
03/17/1997Motion or Writ Granted
02/24/1997motion for extension of time to file sfacts
02/24/1997Filing Fee Paid
01/27/1997Motion or Writ Granted
01/08/1997Filing Fee Paid
01/08/1997motion for extension of time to file sfacts
12/04/1996Motion or Writ Granted
11/20/1996Motion or Writ Granted
11/12/1996Brief Filed
11/12/1996Filing Fee Paid
11/06/1996motion for extension of time to file sfacts
11/06/1996No Description Available.
11/06/1996No Description Available.
10/28/1996Response to Motion Filed
10/21/1996motion for extension of time to file bond
10/21/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/18/1996Surety Bond Filed
07/29/1996request for findings of fact & conclusions filed
07/09/1996Judgment from the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
02/08/2012Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Sone Energy Corp.AppellantHon. Aubrey L. Jones Jr.
Ellis Exploration, Inc.AppelleeMr. James S. Robertson Jr.
Trial Court Information
Honorable Donald R. Ross
96B-18