Case: 20-0315
20-0315
04/20/2020
Multidistrict Litigation
IN RE ARKEMA INC. LITIGATION
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
05/27/2020 | Multidistrict Litigation Reply filed | Movant | Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer to Pretrial Court filed on behalf of Arkema Inc. | |||||||
04/30/2020 | Multidistrict Litigation Joinder filed | Defendant(s) | Joinder in Arkema, Inc's Motion to Transfer filed on behalf of Houston Controls, Inc. field by attorney Marilyn Cayce | |||||||
04/29/2020 | Multidistrict Litigation Joinder filed | Defendant(s) | Joinder in Arkema, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer filed on behalf of ABB Inc. and Kuhlman Electric Corp. filed by attorney Eric Wade | |||||||
04/28/2020 | Multidistrict Litigation Joinder filed | Defendant(s) | Joinder in Arkema, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer filed on behalf of Thermon Heat Tracing Services, Inc., et al. | |||||||
04/28/2020 | Multidistrict Litigation Joinder filed | Defendant(s) | Joinder in Arkema, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer filed on behalf of CenterPoint Energy Houston Electric, LLC. | |||||||
04/27/2020 | Multidistrict Litigation Joinder filed | Defendant(s) | Joinder in Arkema, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer filed on behalf of Cates Control Systems, Inc. | |||||||
04/27/2020 | Multidistrict Litigation Joinder filed | Defendant(s) | Joinder in Arkema, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer filed on behalf of Bureau Veritas North America, Inc. | |||||||
04/20/2020 | Multidistrcit Litigation Motion to Transfer | Movant | Motion to Transfer to Pretrial Court filed on behalf of Arkema Inc. filed by attorney Russell Hardin, Jr. |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/16/2020 | Appointment of Pretrial Judge | MDL Order stating: "The Panel on Multi-District Litigation has decided to designate the 333rd District Court of Harris County, Texas, the Pretrial Court and assign the Honorable Caroline Baker, Senior Judge 295th District Court, as the Pretrial Judge." (9/16/2020 5:54:22 PM) 20-0315 MDL Appointment of Pretrial Judge and Court.pdf |
| |||||||
07/10/2020 | Opinion issued by Multidistrict Litigation Panel | Issued | | |||||||
07/10/2020 | Multidistrict Litigation Motion to Transfer disposed | Filing granted | Defendant Arkema Inc.’s Motion to Transfer under Rule 13 of the Texas Rules of Judicial Administration, filed on April 20, 2020, is granted. The panel will issue a second order at a later date naming the judge to whom the cases will be transferred. (7/10/2020 4:50:29 PM) 20-0315 Per Curiam Opinion Issued - Arkema Inc Litigation.pdf, 20-0315 MDL Order Issued 07-10-20.pdf |
| ||||||
05/27/2020 | Multidistrict Litigation Reply filed | Reply in Support of Motion to Transfer to Pretrial Court filed on behalf of Arkema Inc. | ||||||||
05/18/2020 | Adoption by another party of brief already filed | Joinder And Supplement To Plaintiffs’ And Intervenors’ Joint Response to Arkema, Inc.’s Motion To Transfer to Pretrial Court filed on behalf of Barrett Plaintiffs. | ||||||||
05/18/2020 | Response to Motion filed | Plaintiffs’ and Intervenors’ Joint Response to Defendants’ Motion to Transfer to Pretrial Court filed. | ||||||||
05/08/2020 | Multidistrict Litigation Motion | Plaintiffs’ and Intervenors’ Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion to Transfer filed on behalf of Arkema Inc. | ||||||||
04/30/2020 | Multidistrict Litigation Joinder filed | Joinder in Arkema, Inc's Motion to Transfer filed on behalf of Houston Controls, Inc. field by attorney Marilyn Cayce | ||||||||
04/29/2020 | Multidistrict Litigation Joinder filed | Joinder in Arkema, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer filed on behalf of ABB Inc. and Kuhlman Electric Corp. filed by attorney Eric Wade | ||||||||
04/28/2020 | Multidistrict Litigation Joinder filed | Joinder in Arkema, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer filed on behalf of CenterPoint Energy Houston Electric, LLC. | ||||||||
04/28/2020 | Multidistrict Litigation Joinder filed | Joinder in Arkema, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer filed on behalf of Thermon Heat Tracing Services, Inc., et al. | ||||||||
04/27/2020 | Multidistrict Litigation Joinder filed | Joinder in Arkema, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer filed on behalf of Cates Control Systems, Inc. | ||||||||
04/27/2020 | Multidistrict Litigation Joinder filed | Joinder in Arkema, Inc.'s Motion to Transfer filed on behalf of Bureau Veritas North America, Inc. | ||||||||
04/22/2020 | MDL Motion to Stay disposed | Filing granted | Request for Stay granted (4/22/2020 3:41:22 PM) 20-0315 MDL Stay Order Issued 04-22-20.pdf |
| ||||||
04/21/2020 | Motion to Stay filed before the MDL Panel | Request for Stay of All Proceedings filed on behalf of Arkema incorporated within Motion to Transfer filed by attorney J. Christopher Reynolds | ||||||||
04/20/2020 | Multidistrcit Litigation Motion to Transfer | Motion to Transfer to Pretrial Court filed on behalf of Arkema Inc. filed by attorney Russell Hardin, Jr. |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Graves Plaintiffs | Respondent | Mr. Muhammad S. Aziz |
Arkema Inc. | Movant | Mr. J. Christopher Reynolds |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information