judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 10th Court Of Appeals

Case: 10-96-00231-CR
10-96-00231-CR
10/21/1996
Other Felony
Dale Allen Hamer
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/25/1997Case stored
06/25/1997Mandate issued by this Court
05/07/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/09/1997Submitted
04/09/1997Submission
03/24/1997Submission
03/03/1997Brief filed, oral argument not requested
03/03/1997Case ready to be set
01/22/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
01/15/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
01/10/1997Brief filed, oral argument requested
01/02/1997Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/20/1996Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
12/04/1996Motion for extension of time to file brief disposedMotion or Writ Granted
11/27/1996Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed
10/29/1996No Description Available.
10/29/1996No Description Available.
10/24/1996No Description Available.
10/21/1996Notice of Appeal filed
10/21/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
06/25/2022Case StoredDestroy case in 25 years.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Hamer, Dale AllenAppellantRob Lawing
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasBill Moore
David W. Vernon
Trial Court Information
18th District Court
Johnson
Honorable Derwood Johnson
30909
20 yrs $10,000 fine