judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-96-00320-CV
09-96-00320-CV
10/21/1996
Appeal from a summary judgment
LaRue, Joe and Phyllis LaRue
GeneScreen, Inc., et al
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/23/1998Mandate Issued
07/23/1998MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
07/20/1998order received from another court
06/05/1998Petition for WritMotion or Writ Denied
04/01/1998Petition for WritFiled in Higher Court
02/23/1998Mt for ext of time to file Petition for WritMotion or Writ Granted
12/18/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/13/1997Submitted
11/13/1997Submission
08/04/1997Submission
07/29/1997Motion to Strike DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
07/14/1997Motion to Strike Filed
04/10/1997Motion to Strike DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/31/1997Motion to Strike Filed
03/07/1997Supplemental Brief Filed
02/14/1997Brief Filed
02/14/1997Case ready to be set
02/06/1997Miscellaneous MotionsMotion or Writ Denied
01/28/1997Response
01/24/1997Response
01/15/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/15/1997Miscellaneous Motions
01/13/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
12/17/1996Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
12/16/1996Brief Filed
12/13/1996Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/20/1996Brief Filed
11/20/1996mediation form received from attorney
10/29/1996mediation form received from attorney
10/28/1996mediation form received from attorney
10/21/1996Transcript Filed
10/21/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/23/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Baylor College Of MedicineAppelleeTerriann Trostle
Charles W. Hurd
Genescreen, Inc., Et AlAppelleeRobert K. Wise
Larue, Joe JoeAppellantMarcy Lynn Rothman
Trial Court Information
60th District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Gary Sanderson
B-152521