judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-96-01297-CV
14-96-01297-CV
10/21/1996
Miscellaneous civil
Casa Ford, Inc. and North River Insurance Co. & Casa Ford, Inc. and Western Alliance Insurance Co.
Ford Motor Co.
No
6th Court of Appeals
11/01/1996
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/01/1996Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGRANTED
11/01/1996Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGRANTED
11/01/1996Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGRANTED
11/01/1996Case transferred from this court to another court of appealsGRANTED
10/21/1996Transcript FILED
10/21/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/26/1996Statement of Facts RECEIVED - ANT, APP, REL
09/11/1996Bond FILED
08/27/1996Extend time to file statement of facts FILED
08/06/1996Bond FILED
06/24/1996Judgment signed by trial court judge
01/10/1996Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law FILED
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/01/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
ALLIANCE, WESTERNAppelleeNicholas E. Zito
Randall D. Wilkins
MOTOR, FORDAppelleeMichael S. Goldberg
Michael Lee Calhoon
RIVER, NORTHAppellantJimmy Williamson
Trial Court Information
234th District Court
Harris
Honorable SCOTT A. BRISTER
93-60338