judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-96-01679-CR
05-96-01679-CR
10/24/1996
Theft
Gipson, Gary Donald
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
09/03/1998Mandate Issued
09/03/1998Mandate Issued
06/04/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/04/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
05/20/1998Submitted
05/20/1998Submission
05/20/1998Submitted
03/26/1998Letter Filed
03/16/1998Submission
10/04/1997MattConv
09/30/1997Brief Filed
06/06/1997MattConv
06/06/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
06/05/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
05/30/1997MattConv
05/12/1997Brief Filed
04/30/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/25/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
04/12/1997MattConv
03/27/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/25/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/13/1997MattConv
02/12/1997MattConv
02/11/1997Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
02/11/1997Statement of Facts Filed
02/11/1997Statement of Facts Filed
02/06/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
01/27/1997Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Denied
01/21/1997Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
01/10/1997MattConv
01/10/1997Transcript Due
12/09/1996Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/09/1996Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Granted
12/06/1996MattConv
12/06/1996Transcript Filed
12/02/1996Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
12/02/1996Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/26/1996Mot for Ext Transcript DispMotion or Writ Denied
11/26/1996Mot for Ext Stat of Facts DispMotion or Writ Denied
11/18/1996Mot - Ext. to File Transcript
11/18/1996Mot-Ext. to File Stat of Facts
11/10/1996Record due
10/25/1996Notice Sent
10/24/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
09/30/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
09/11/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
09/03/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Gipson, Gary DonaldCriminal - AppellantJeffrey Robert Sandberg
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasWendy Koster
Trial Court Information
195th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable John R. Nelms
F96-44616-MN
8 YRS PEN/2,000 FINE