judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 13th Court Of Appeals

Case: 13-96-00532-CV
13-96-00532-CV
10/24/1996
Personal Injuries/Damages
Beltran, Rita A.
Bjorum, James Hollister
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
06/23/2003Record sent to storage
07/06/1999Filing Fee Paid
06/21/1999Where's f/f
07/21/1998Mandate Issued
04/30/1998Motion for rehearing disposedOverruled
04/30/1998Mot. for leave to file motion for rehear DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
04/17/1998Filing Fee Paid
04/17/1998Response to _____________.
04/16/1998Motion for leave to file motion for rehearing
04/07/1998Filing Fee Paid
04/06/1998Motion for rehearing filed
04/06/1998Motion for rehearing
03/19/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/26/1998Motion for leave to file Reply Brief DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
02/19/1998Miscellaneous Motion DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/12/1998Reply Brief Filed
02/12/1998Filing Fee Paid
02/12/1998Motion for leave to file reply brief
02/12/1998Reply brief markd
02/05/1998Submitted
02/05/1998Miscellaneous Motion
02/05/1998Submission
01/05/1998Entry of Judge Selection for Case.
01/05/1998Submission
03/06/1997Motion for leave to file brief DISPOSEDMotion or Writ Granted
02/21/1997Motion for leave to file brief
02/19/1997Brief Filed
02/19/1997Case ready to be set
02/19/1997Brief received.
02/19/1997Oral argument requested
02/14/1997Green card in
02/12/199710 day letter sent
01/16/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
01/03/1997Oral argument requested
01/02/1997Brief Filed
11/26/1996Supplemental transcript filed
11/18/1996Order received from trial court
11/13/1996Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
11/04/1996Statement Filed
11/01/1996Green card in
10/30/1996Statement Filed
10/29/199610 day letter sent
10/25/1996Statement of Facts Filed
10/25/1996Statement of Facts Number of Pages in Remarks
10/25/1996Filing Fee Paid
10/25/1996Statement of Facts Received
10/24/1996Transcript Filed
10/24/1996Transcript Received
10/24/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/21/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Beltran, Rita A.AppellantRobert G. Smith
Hon. David E. Fast
Bjorum, James HollisterAppelleeHon. Carlos Villarreal
Hon. Montgomery J. 'Monte' English
Trial Court Information
148th District Court
Nueces
Honorable Hilda G. Tagle
93-3603-E