judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JORDAN VS. STATE, DMV

Case Information: 38189
Short Caption:JORDAN VS. STATE, DMVCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9800456AClassification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: En Banc
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:09/07/2001How Submitted:On Record

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/18/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/18/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 01-12241
08/08/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 30 days. fn3--[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] 01-13377
09/07/2001Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal Copy. 01-15168
09/07/2001Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
06/05/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Directing Response. Respondent shall have 30 days from this order's date to demonstrate why the district court's order should not be reversed and the case remanded for further proceedings. 03-09395
07/01/2003MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Respondent's Brief. 03-11041
07/22/2003Other Returned Mail. Receipt for Documents dated 06/26/03 addressed to James Jordan forwarded to corrected address.
04/14/2005Opinion/DispositionalFiled Per Curiam Opinion. "Affirmed in part, reversed in part and remanded." fn89[Although Jordan was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, see NRAP 46(b), we have considered the proper person documents received from Jordan. In light of this opinion, we deny his proper person requests as moot. Jordan's request to remand this matter to a different department is denied.] Before the Court EN BANC. Author: Per Curiam. Majority: Becker, C.J., Rose, Maupin, Gibbons, Douglas, Hardesty, and Parraguirre, JJ. 121 Nev. Adv. Opn. No. 7. EN BANC. Nos. 38189/39052 - cases are not consolidated. 05-07280
05/25/2005Notice/OutgoingIssued Letter. to the Publishers from Cay Jordan, Editor. Correction on the original opinion: page 1, 2, 12 and 35. Nos. 38189/39052 - cases are not consolidated.
06/06/2005Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. fn 1-[The clerk of this court shall file the proper person petition for rehearing, provisionally received in this court on May 2, 2005. ". . . we deny rehearing." NRAP 40(c). 05-11007
06/06/2005Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Proper Person Petition for Rehearing. Letter dated April 28, 2005. 05-08601
07/01/2005RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 05-13079
07/01/2005Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
07/22/2005RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on July 5, 2005. 05-13079