judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-265
A-265
07/17/1944
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. GILMER PEEK, ET AL.
G. S. BERNY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/18/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
11/06/1944Brief on the MeritsPetitioner
11/02/1944Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
11/01/1944Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
07/26/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
07/17/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
12/18/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
12/18/1944Motion to Argue filed
11/06/1944Brief on the Merits
11/02/1944Supplemental Brief filed
11/01/1944Letter Filed
11/01/1944Supplemental Brief filed
10/04/1944Document received (See Remarks)
10/04/1944Document received (See Remarks)
07/26/1944Response to Petition
07/17/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/17/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
G. S. Berny, et al.Respondent
Mrs. Gilmer Peek, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information