judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

LIGOTTI (DAVID) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38188
Short Caption:LIGOTTI (DAVID) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 34252
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C155147Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Post-Conviction
Disqualifications:Case Status:Disposition Filed/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/18/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/18/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-12233
09/21/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. To date, no fast track statement has been filed. Counsel for appellant shall file and serve the fast track statement and appendix within 10 days of this order or show cause why counsel for appellant should not be sanctioned. 01-15982
10/03/2001MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Appellant's Response to Order Dated September 21, 2001. 01-16659
11/05/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On October 3, 2001, Mr. Amesbury filed a response to this court's order of September 21, 2001. Mr. Amesbury is obligated to prepare the fast track statement because he represented appellant in the district court. Mr. Amesbury shall have 20 days from the date of this order to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. Although this court has determined that sanctions are not warranted at this time. Mr. Amesbury is cautioned that this court expects him to comply fully with the requirements of NRAP 3C and the orders of this court. 01-18417
12/21/2001MotionFiled Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Withdraw Appeal. 01-21548
01/07/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. On December 21, 2001, this court received a stipulation from the parties requesting that this appeal be dismissed. We prefer that a stipulation or motion for such dismissal be accompanied by the affidavit of appellant or appellant's counsel indicating that counsel has explained to appellant the legal effects and consequences of a dismissal of the appeal. Counsel for appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order to supplement the stipulation to dismiss this appeal with an affidavit containing the above-described assertions. The briefing schedule for this case is suspended pending further order of this court. 02-00335
02/04/2002MotionFiled Response to Order to Show Cause. Response to Supreme Court Order dated January 7, 2002. 02-02309
02/07/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. of Response to Supreme Court Order. 02-02501
03/05/2002Order/DispositionalFiled Stipulated Dismissal. On December 21, 2001, this court received a stipulation from the parties requesting that this appeal be dismissed. On February 4, 2002, appellant's counsel filed a response to this court's order of January 7, 2002. The stipulation to withdraw this appeal is approved, and we "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." NNP02-MS/RR/NB 02-03945
03/05/2002Case Status Update Case Closed. No remittitur issued.