judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ROBERT LOVATO and BART STEWART v. H&E EQUIPMENT SERVICES LLC

Case Heading (S-07-0204)
Case Number:S-07-0204Case Docketed On:08/29/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Second Judicial District Carbon CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Personal Injury
Short Title:ROBERT LOVATO and BART STEWART v. H&E EQUIPMENT SERVICES LLC
Full Title:ROBERT LOVATO and BART STEWART, Appellants (Plaintiffs), v. H&E EQUIPMENT SERVICES LLC, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantRobert LovatoGeorge Santini
Russell Weldon Sinnett
AppellantBart StewartGeorge Santini
Russell Weldon Sinnett
AppelleeH&E Equipment Services LLCRobert Carl Jarosh

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
08/29/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
08/29/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
08/29/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal
08/29/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
10/15/2007Brief - Appellants'BriefAppellantFinal
10/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record from counsel for appellantNotice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
10/18/2007Notice-Incoming - Amended indexNotice-IncomingAmended indexFinal
10/22/2007Notice-Incoming - Designation of record (appellants' supplemental)Notice-IncomingDesignation of recordFinal
12/03/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on cd; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
12/07/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
12/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Robert Jarosh for appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - George Santini for appellants.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
12/18/2007Brief - Appellant replyBriefAppellant replyFinal
12/26/2007Notice-Incoming - Errata to brief of appelleeNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
12/26/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
01/08/2008Record - Transmitted record on appeal, eleven volumes. Volumes I-VI, original papers; Volume VII, exhibits; Volumes VIII-IX, transcripts; Volume X, depositions; volume XI, exhibits.RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
01/08/2008Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
01/11/2008Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
01/11/2008Motion - Dismiss - voluntaryMotionDismiss - voluntaryFinal
01/11/2008Order - Dismiss - voluntary or stipulatedOrderDismiss - voluntary or stipulatedFinal
01/11/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
01/16/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for on 1/15/08 by L. Glode.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal