judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

DALLAS ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY v. BRANUM COMPANY

Case: A-264
A-264
07/17/1944
Application for Writ of Error
DALLAS ELECTRIC SUPPLY COMPANY
BRANUM COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
02/14/1945Motion for RehearingPetitioner
10/30/1944Supplemental Brief filedPetitioner
09/13/1944Supplement to ResponseRespondent
07/27/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
07/17/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
03/15/1945Letter Filed
02/17/1945Response to Motion filed
02/14/1945Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/30/1944Supplemental Brief filed
10/04/1944Document received (See Remarks)
10/04/1944Document received (See Remarks)
10/04/1944Document received (See Remarks)
09/13/1944Supplement to Response
07/27/1944Response to Petition
07/17/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/17/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dallas Electric Supply CompanyPetitioner
Branum CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information