judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals

Case: 09-96-00328-CR
09-96-00328-CR
10/24/1996
Assault or Attempted Murder
Allison, Bobby
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/11/1997Mandate Issued
08/11/1997MANDATE ISSUED FROM HIGHER COURT AND CASE STORED
06/25/1997Opinion issuedAffirmed
06/11/1997Submitted
06/11/1997Submission
06/03/1997Brief Filed
06/03/1997Case ready to be set
04/22/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
04/16/1997Brief Filed
04/16/1997Brief received, not filed
04/16/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
03/11/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/06/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/21/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
02/18/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/12/1997notification that brief of ant not filed
12/03/1996Statement of Facts Filed
12/03/1996Transcript Filed
11/27/1996Statement of Facts Received
10/24/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/24/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
08/11/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Allison, BobbyAppellantJohn D. Reeves
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasClyde M. Herrington
Trial Court Information
159th District Court
Angelina
Honorable Gerald A Goodwin
18832
8 years probated