judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-96-00465-CR
02-96-00465-CR
10/24/1996
All Misdemeanors
Priester, Alex Daniel
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/28/1998Mandate Issued
01/29/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/14/1997Submitted
10/14/1997Submission
10/01/1997Letter
09/18/1997Letter
07/29/1997Letter
06/02/1997Brief Filed
06/02/1997Case ready to be set
05/14/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
05/12/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
03/13/1997Submission
03/10/1997Brief Filed
01/07/1997No Description Available.
11/08/1996No Description Available.Motion or Writ Granted
11/05/1996No Description Available.
10/24/1996No Description Available.
10/24/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/28/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasBruce Isaacks
Priester, Alex DanielCriminal - AppellantNeil L. Durrance
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 1
Denton
Honorable R. E. Thornton
CR-95-07424-D
365 days jail & $603 fine