Case: 10-20-00183-CV
10-20-00183-CV
07/09/2020
Plea to jurisdiction
Joshua Development GP, LLC, as the General Partner of Joshua Development Company, Ltd.
Johnson County Special Utility District
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/11/2020 | Reply brief filed | Appellee |
| ||
11/10/2020 | Reply brief filed | Appellant |
| ||
10/22/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested | Appellant |
| ||
09/10/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument requested | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
12/11/2020 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||
11/10/2020 | Reply brief filed |
| |||||
11/10/2020 | Notice filed |
| |||||
10/22/2020 | Case ready to be set | | |||||
10/22/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument not requested |
| |||||
10/06/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||
10/06/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
09/10/2020 | Brief filed - oral argument requested |
| |||||
08/05/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Grant motion |
| ||||
08/05/2020 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||
07/20/2020 | Reporters record filed |
| |||||
07/17/2020 | Clerks record filed |
| |||||
07/14/2020 | Docketing statement filed | ||||||
07/13/2020 | Notice of appeal received | | |||||
07/09/2020 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
07/01/2020 | Request for findings of fact and conclusions of law | | |||||
06/24/2020 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
10/26/2020 | At Issue | Ready for disposition on briefs |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Joshua Development GP, LLC as the General Partner of Joshua Development Company, Ltd. | Appellant | Jason M. Willett Arthur J. Anderson |
Johnson County Special Utility District | Appellee | D. Scott Cain Colby S. Rideout |
Trial Court Information
413th District Court
Johnson
Honorable William C. Bosworth
DC-C201900699
Pamela Waits