Case: 04-93-00417-CV
04-93-00417-CV
07/06/1993
Miscellaneous civil
Longoria, Manuel; Tart, Jr., Robert; and Pittman, Jerry
City of San Antonio; The Firefighters' & Police Officers' Civil Service Commission and Powers, Tyrone
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
05/05/1995 | Original Exhibits Returned | | |
05/03/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
05/03/1995 | Case Returned from Higher Court | | |
05/03/1995 | Mandate Issued | | |
03/23/1995 | Higher Court Decision | Motion or Writ Denied | |
10/12/1994 | Information regarding cause received | | |
10/04/1994 | Case Forwarded to Higher Court | | |
09/23/1994 | Writ of Error filed | | |
08/30/1994 | Motion for Rehearing Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
08/16/1994 | Response to Motion Filed | | |
08/10/1994 | Motion for Rehearing Filed | | |
07/27/1994 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
07/27/1994 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
03/09/1994 | Submitted | | |
03/09/1994 | Submission | | |
03/09/1994 | Submitted | | |
03/08/1994 | No New Event but Update in Calendar | | |
02/09/1994 | Motion to Advance Disposed | Filing is Moot | |
02/09/1994 | Motion to Advance Disposed | Filing is Moot | |
01/31/1994 | Submission | | |
01/27/1994 | Motion to Advance Filed | | |
01/27/1994 | Motion to Advance Filed | | |
01/11/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
01/11/1994 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/11/1994 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
01/11/1994 | Case ready to be set | | |
12/16/1993 | Motion Filed | | |
12/16/1993 | Motion Filed | | |
12/03/1993 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/03/1993 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/03/1993 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/16/1993 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
11/16/1993 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
11/04/1993 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/04/1993 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/04/1993 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
11/01/1993 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
11/01/1993 | Brief Filed | | |
11/01/1993 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
11/01/1993 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
10/05/1993 | Brief Filed | | |
10/05/1993 | Requests Oral Argument | | |
09/29/1993 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/29/1993 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/08/1993 | Mot. EOT to file Brief Filed | | |
08/09/1993 | No Description Available. | | |
08/09/1993 | Exhibits Filed | | |
07/23/1993 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/23/1993 | No Description Available. | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/08/1993 | No Description Available. | | |
07/06/1993 | No Description Available. | | |
07/06/1993 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
06/08/1993 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |
06/08/1993 | Appeal Bond Filed | | |
05/10/1993 | Judgment Signed in Trial Court | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
05/03/1995 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Intervenor - Tyrone Powers | Appellee | Mayo J. Galindo |
City Of San Antonio, Et Al. | Appellee | Paula Dlugosz |
Manuel Longoria; Et Al. | Appellant | Harry A. Nass, Jr. James M. Parker |
Trial Court Information
45th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Ronald Guy Carr
93-CI-03826
N/A