judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-96-01674-CR
05-96-01674-CR
10/24/1996
Other Felony
Renfro, Michael Leroy
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/16/1998Record Returned
07/09/1998Mandate Issued
07/09/1998Mandate Issued
04/28/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/28/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
04/03/1998Submission
01/29/1998Letter Sent by the Court
12/19/1997Letter Sent by the Court
11/06/1997Letter Sent by the Court
11/05/1997Letter Received
06/19/1997MattConv
06/03/1997MattConv
06/03/1997Brief Filed
05/09/1997Brief Filed
04/16/1997Letter Sent by the Court
04/14/1997Letter Received
03/07/1997Mot. for Ext. File Brief Disp.Motion or Writ Granted
03/05/1997MattConv
03/05/1997Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
02/03/1997Transcript Filed
01/15/1997Record due
01/13/1997Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed
11/23/1996MattConv
10/25/1996Notice Sent
10/24/1996Statement of Facts Filed
10/24/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/04/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
09/20/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
09/17/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/09/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasApril E. Smith
Renfro, Michael LeroyCriminal - AppellantRobert P. Abbott
Victoria E. Abbott
Trial Court Information
194th Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable M. Boyd Patterson
F95-31291-IM
4 YRS PEN