Case: 02-19-00048-CR
02-19-00048-CR
02/07/2019
Evading Arrest
Ross Williams Carneal
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
09/16/2019 | Brief was not filed | State | | ||||
05/20/2019 | Anders brief filed | Appellant |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/06/2020 | Mandate issued | Modified/Reformed and Affirmed |
| ||||||
10/24/2019 | Motion to withdraw attorney disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||||
10/24/2019 | Memorandum opinion issued | Modified/Reformed and Affirmed |
| ||||||
10/22/2019 | Submitted | | |||||||
10/01/2019 | Set for submission on briefs |
| |||||||
09/23/2019 | Letter received |
| |||||||
09/16/2019 | Case ready to be set | | |||||||
09/16/2019 | Brief was not filed | | |||||||
08/08/2019 | Response was not filed |
| |||||||
05/21/2019 | Motion received |
| |||||||
05/20/2019 | Anders brief filed |
| |||||||
05/20/2019 | Motion to withdraw attorney filed |
| |||||||
04/17/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief disposed | Motion or Writ Granted |
| ||||||
04/17/2019 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed |
| |||||||
03/20/2019 | Electronic Reporter/Recorders Record Filed |
| |||||||
03/19/2019 | Electronic Clerks Record Filed |
| |||||||
02/18/2019 | Docketing statement filed | | |||||||
02/07/2019 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/06/2020 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Carneal, Ross Williams | Criminal - Appellant | Ross Williams Carneal |
The State of Texas | Criminal - State of Texas | Ryan Sinclair |
Trial Court Information
355th District Court
Hood
Honorable Ralph H. Walton
CR13415
Court Reporter, 355th District Court
10 Yrs TDCJ