judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-96-01687-CV
05-96-01687-CV
10/28/1996
Mandamus
MUSE, VIOLET L.
COUNTY COURT AT LAW NO. 2 OF DALLAS COUNTY
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/19/2016Order enteredDestroy
02/17/2016Letter issued by the court
08/06/1997Retention time case file will be retainedDestroy
10/28/1996Case stored
10/28/1996Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/28/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/28/1996Motion to File DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
10/25/1996Motion for Leave to File
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
10/19/2016Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Muse, VIolet L.AppellantDonald W. Mills
County Court At Law No. 2 Of DAppelleeDavid Hicks
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 2
Dallas
Honorable Carlos G. Lopez
96-1509-B