judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

FRED LEWIS v. AMERICAN SURETY COMPANY

Case: A-275
A-275
07/20/1944
Application for Writ of Error
FRED LEWIS
AMERICAN SURETY COMPANY
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/15/1944Motion for RehearingRespondent
07/29/1944Reply to ResponsePetitioner
07/25/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
07/20/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
06/22/1945Letter Filed
12/28/1944Response to Motion filed
12/15/1944Letter Filed
12/15/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
11/07/1944Affidavit of Inability to Pay Court Costs
10/04/1944Document received (See Remarks)
07/29/1944Reply to Response
07/25/1944Response to Petition
07/20/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
07/20/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Fred LewisPetitioner
American Surety CompanyRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information