judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WILLIAMS (SEAN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38184
Short Caption:WILLIAMS (SEAN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Humboldt Co. - Sixth Judicial District - 963764Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/17/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) 01-12160
07/17/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Rough Draft Transcript(s). Transcripts requested: July 9, 2001. Court Reporter: Lee Bahr. Filed in district court on: July 13, 2001. 01-12161
08/28/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Order Granting Extension Per Telephonic Request. Fast Track Statement and Appendix due: September 4, 2001. 01-14511
09/04/2001MotionFiled Motion for Excess Pages. (Fast Track Statement). 01-14929
09/11/2001Order/Clerk'sFiled Clerk's Order Granting Motion. filed September 4, 2001. The clerk shall file the 12 page fast track statement and appendix received on September 4, 2001. 01-15286
09/11/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-14883
09/11/2001AppendixFiled Appendix to Fast Track Statement. 01-14884
09/25/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-16172
12/06/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. Having considered appellant's contentions and concluded that they are without merit, we 'ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED.' NNP02-MS/RR/NB 01-20439
01/02/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-20770
01/02/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
01/18/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 3, 2002. 01-20770