judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-96-01699-CR
05-96-01699-CR
10/28/1996
Other Drug Possession
GRIDER, FLOYD SIMON
TEXAS, THE STATE OF
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/03/1996Case stored
12/03/1996Number VoidedVoided
12/03/1996Number VoidedVoided
10/29/1996Notice Sent
10/28/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/07/1996Record due
08/08/1996Judgment Entered by the Trial Court
08/08/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/03/1996Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Grider, Floyd SimonCriminal - AppellantTerri Hamby
Texas, The State OfCriminal - State of TexasSue Korioth
Trial Court Information
292nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Verla S Holland
F94-59994-V
1 1/2 YRS STA JL