judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 2nd Court Of Appeals

Case: 02-96-00493-CR
02-96-00493-CR
10/28/1996
All Misdemeanors
Jones, Charles Allen
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
04/03/1998Mandate Issued
01/22/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
12/23/1997Submitted
12/23/1997Submission
12/02/1997Letter
12/02/1997Submission
05/27/1997Brief Filed
05/27/1997Case ready to be set
03/12/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/03/1997Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
01/28/1997Brief Filed
12/30/1996Motion for Extension to File Brief DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
12/27/1996Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed
10/28/1996Criminal record or relator's record and/or exhibits
10/28/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/03/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasBruce Isaacks
Jones, Charles AllenCriminal - AppellantHenry C. Paine Jr.
Trial Court Information
County Criminal Court No. 2
Denton
Honorable Virgil Vahlenkamp
CR-94-03427-B
90daysjail/prob 1 yr&400fn