judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5977
B-5977
05/04/1976
Application for Writ of Error
JAMES E. LEE
JAMES E. THOMAS, LILLIAN THOMAS PRICE, TRUDY M. THOMAS AND ROBERT H. OSBURN
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
08/11/1976Brief in Support of PetitionRespondent
08/11/1976Exhibits in case/cause filedRespondent
05/24/1976Supplement to Petition filedPetitioner
05/19/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
05/14/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
05/04/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/11/1976Brief in Support of Petition
08/11/1976Exhibits in case/cause filed
08/11/1976Motion for leave to file writ of prohibition
08/11/1976Letter Filed
07/13/1976Letter Filed
05/24/1976Supplement to Petition filed
05/19/1976Response to Petition
05/14/1976Miscellaneous Motion
05/14/1976Response to Petition
05/04/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/04/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Trudy M. Thomas and Robert H. OsburnRespondent
James E. LeePetitioner
Lillian Thomas PriceRespondent
James E. ThomasRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information