judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals

Case: 03-96-00600-CR
03-96-00600-CR
10/28/1996
Murder
Justin Thomas
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
10/28/1999Case stored
09/21/1998Mandate Acknowledgment
07/07/1998Mandate Issued
03/17/1998Correction filed
03/12/1998Opinion issuedAffirmed
11/26/1997Brief filed
11/21/1997Submitted
11/21/1997Submission
11/20/1997Motion to Strike DisposedOverruled
11/10/1997Motion to Strike Filed
10/30/1997Submission
10/24/1997Case ready to be set
09/24/1997Brief filed
08/22/1997Exhibits filed
08/22/1997Statement of Facts Filed
07/24/1997Order Entered
07/08/1997Supplemental Statement of Facts Filed
06/25/1997Supplemental Transcript filed
06/12/1997Notice received
06/09/1997Status of Court's Remand Order
02/21/1997Letter received
02/06/1997Order Entered
10/29/1996Statement of facts overdue
10/28/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/28/1996Transcript Filed
10/28/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/07/1998Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasThe Honorable Ronald Earle
Ms. Lisa Stewart
State Prosecuting AttorneyInterested partyThe Honorable Matthew W. Paul
Thomas, JustinAppellantMr. Patrick R. Ganne
Trial Court Information
331st District Court
Travis
Honorable L. L. Fuller
0954512
LIFE