judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 3rd Court Of Appeals

Case: 03-96-00604-CR
03-96-00604-CR
10/28/1996
Other Felony
Jeannetta Smith
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/17/1998Case stored
03/27/1997Mandate Issued
03/27/1997Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/14/1997Motion for Dismissal Filed
01/02/1997Mo. for Ext. filed & disposed ofMotion or Writ Granted
12/27/1996Mot. for Ext. to File Brief
10/28/1996Transcript & SF Filed
10/28/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/27/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Court Of Criminal AppealsInterested partyThe Honorable Troy C. Bennett Jr.
State Prosecuting AttorneyInterested partyThe Honorable Matthew W. Paul
The State Of TexasCriminal - State of TexasMs. Dana Nolen
The Honorable Stephen R. Lupton
The Honorable Charlotte Harris
Smith, JeannettaAppellantMr. Kirk Hawkins
Trial Court Information
51st District Court
Tom Green
Honorable Dick Alcala
A-95-0554-S
5 yrs. (PROBATED)