judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-96-01314-CR
01-96-01314-CR
10/28/1996
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Cortez, Luis Alberto
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/02/1999Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/02/1999Mandate issued - criminal or civil
10/04/1999Case file returned from higher Court or agency.
09/08/1999Petition for discretionary review disposedRefused
06/24/1999Case file received by higher Court or agency.
06/22/1999Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
06/18/1999Case file forwarded to higher Court or agency
04/15/1999Extension of time to file PDR disposed by Court of Criminal Appeals.Grant motion
04/12/1999Petition for Discretionary Review Filed
03/19/1999Motion for Rehearing Due
03/04/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/04/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
03/04/1999Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/15/1998Submitted
09/15/1998Submission
09/15/1998Submitted
08/04/1998Submission
05/12/1998Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
05/12/1998Case ready to be set
05/12/1998Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
05/12/1998Case ready to be set
05/06/1998Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
05/02/1998Brief Due
04/02/1998Brief filed-oral argument has been requested
04/02/1998Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
04/02/1998order issued, case stayed or abated.Grant motion
03/13/1998Brief received only-oral argument requested
03/13/1998Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
03/03/1998Order entered
06/19/1997Brief Due
05/29/1997Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
05/20/1997Statement of facts filed
05/01/1997Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
04/21/1997Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
02/20/1997Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
02/20/1997Statement of Facts Due
01/23/1997Motion to extend time to file state of facts dispGrant motion
01/02/1997Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
12/24/1996Record due
12/23/1996Transcript filed
10/28/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/25/1996Date of Sentence in Criminal Case
10/25/1996Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/02/1999Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
CORTEZ, LUIS ALBERTOCriminal - AppellantRosemary Garza
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of TexasJohn B. Holmes
Keli Pool Roper
Trial Court Information
351st District Court
Harris
Honorable LEE DUGGAN
9419548
25 yrs