judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: B-5978
B-5978
05/04/1976
Application for Writ of Error
NICHOLAS AND BARRERA
FROST NATIONAL BANK OF SAN ANTONIO
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
07/28/1976Motion for RehearingPetitioner
05/28/1976Reply to ResponsePetitioner
05/19/1976Response to PetitionRespondent
05/04/1976Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/31/1976Response to Motion filed
07/28/1976Motion for RehearingOverruled
05/28/1976Reply to Response
05/19/1976Response to Petition
05/04/1976Application for Writ of Error - Filed
05/04/1976Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Frost National Bank of San AntonioRespondent
NICHOLAS AND BARRERAPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information