Case: 03-19-00779-CV
03-19-00779-CV
10/30/2019
Mandamus
In re M2E3 LLC
Yes
www.txcourts.gov/3rdcoa
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
10/30/2019 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed | Relator |
|
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
01/09/2020 | Memorandum opinion issued | Dismissed on Appellant's Motion |
| ||||
01/09/2020 | Motion to dismiss disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | | ||||
01/08/2020 | Submitted | | |||||
11/20/2019 | Motion to dismiss filed |
| |||||
11/08/2019 | Telephone call received | | |||||
11/01/2019 | Telephone call received | | |||||
10/30/2019 | Petition for writ of mandamus filed |
|
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
01/09/2020 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Steinhauser, Jeff R. | Respondent | |
M2E3 LLC | Relator | Mr. Andrew Edelman Mr. Thomas J. Forestier The Honorable Wallace B. Jefferson Shannon Keefe |
Schwarz, Junior, Emile John | Real party in interest | Soledad Maria Valenciano Mr. Marcus F. Schwartz James Kenneth Spivey |
Trial Court Information
155th District Court
Fayette
Honorable Jeff R. Steinhauser
392