judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WARD (JOHN) VS. STATE

Case Information: 38183
Short Caption:WARD (JOHN) VS. STATECourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR011000Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
07/17/2001Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
07/17/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person Fast Track. (Fast track notice mailed to trial counsel.) 01-12150
07/25/2001Transcript RequestFiled Certificate of No Transcript Request. 01-12588
08/03/2001MotionFiled Motion to Dismiss Appeal. 01-13134
08/06/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Withdraw "Notice of Withdrawal of Appeal." 01-13214
08/14/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. On August 3, 2001, appellant filed a motion to withdraw this appeal voluntarily. On August 6, 2001, appellant filed a motion to withdraw his motion to withdraw this appeal. Cause appearing, the latter motion is granted. Counsel for appellant shall have 30 days from the date of this order within which to file and serve the fast track statement and appendix. 01-13775
09/11/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. 01-15306
09/11/2001AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. 01-15307
09/24/2001MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Correct Fast Track Statement. 01-16046
09/25/2001Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. 01-16171
09/27/2001Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Stipulation Approved. The fast track statement is corrected to reflect that appellant was sentenced by the Hon. Steve Dobrescu. 01-16305
10/12/2001Order/DispositionalFiled Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of conviction AFFIRMED." fn6[We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP02Y-CY/DA/ML 01-17207
11/07/2001RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 01-17363
11/07/2001Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/15/2001RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 9, 2001. 01-17363