Case Heading (S-07-0199) | |||||
Case Number: | S-07-0199 | Case Docketed On: | 08/27/2007 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Seventh Judicial District Natrona County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against Public Administration 6-5-101 - 6-5-307 | ||
Short Title: | BRENT LEE SIX v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | BRENT LEE SIX, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Brent Lee Six | Diane M. Lozano Tina N. Olson David E. Westling |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Terry L. Armitage D. Michael Pauling Bruce A. Salzburg Graham Macdonald Smith |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law -Jury Instructions, Criminal Law -Procedure |
Opinion Number: | 2008 WY 42 |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
08/27/2007 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
08/27/2007 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
08/27/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
10/15/2007 | Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal. | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
11/19/2007 | Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk and designation of record | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
12/07/2007 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
12/10/2007 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
12/11/2007 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Graham Macdonald Smith for appellee. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
12/13/2007 | Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - David Westling for appellant. | Notice-Incoming | Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting | Final | |
12/14/2007 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, four volumes. Volume I, Original Papers; Volume II, Transcripts; Volume III, Confidential Information; Volume IV, Exhibits | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
01/15/2008 | Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (David E. Westling, Senior Assistant Public Defender for appellant; Graham Macdonald Smith, Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement. | Event | Oral argument presented | Final | |
01/15/2008 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
04/09/2008 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming. Justice Hill writing for the Court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
04/25/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
04/25/2008 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
04/25/2008 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
04/25/2008 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
04/30/2008 | Service - Certified mail signature return card | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |