judyrecords
search tips
750 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

TONY M. WILKERSON V. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 10-CM-1073
Short Caption:TONY M. WILKERSON V. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Misdemeanor - Destruction Of Property
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CMD7108-99Filed Date:08/27/2010

Opening Event Date:08/27/2010Case Status:Decided/Dismissed
Record Completed:10/06/2010Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:
Argued/Submitted:
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:12/21/2011
Costs Waived

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantTony M. Wilkerson Y
James W. KleinNY
Jonathan W. Anderson NN
AppelleeUnited StatesN
Elizabeth TrosmanNY
Roy W. McLeese, IIINN
Shane N. WallerNN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
08/27/2010NOTICE OF APPEAL
09/14/2010 On consideration of the notice of appeal and it appearing that appellant has been found eligible for court appointed counsel, it is ORDERED that James W. Klein, Esquire, is hereby appointed to represent appellant in this appeal. It is FURTHER ORDERED that counsel for appellant shall immediately take the necessary steps to review the trial court record and to ensure that the transcripts necessary to the appeal have been ordered and shall, within 30 days from the date of this order complete and file with this court a single copy of the statement regarding transcript available for completion online. Where transcript(s) necessary for this appeal have been ordered and completed for non-appeal purposes, appellant must advise the Court Reporting and Recording Division to forward said transcript(s) for inclusion in the record on appeal. For the Court, Julio A. Castillo, Clerk (dfe)
09/20/2010STATEMENT REGARDING TRANSCRIPT(S) (rt ordered/needed)dfe
10/06/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #1 (10pgs/Tape) 7/22/10 proc.
10/06/2010SUPPLEMENTAL RECORD - #2 (14pgs/Tape) 7/23/10 proc. w/CD included
10/06/2010RECORD COMPLETED
10/15/2010 It appearing that the complete record on appeal has been filed with this court, it is ORDERED that appellant's brief and the limited appendix including the documents required by D.C. App. R. 30 (f), shall be filed within 40 days from the date of this order, and appellee's brief shall be filed within 30 days thereafter. See D.C. App. R. 31. (Castillo)
10/21/2010RECORD INDEX
10/21/2010RECORD COPIES
11/24/2010APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until February 22, 2010 (no oppo)
12/06/2010 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted, and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before February 22, 2011. (By: JAC)
02/22/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF until May 23, 2011 (no oppo)
03/10/2011 On consideration of appellant's motion for an extension of time within which to file the brief, to which no opposition has been filed, it is ORDERED that the motion is granted and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before May 23, 2011. Any further requests for extensions of time will be looked upon with disfavor and granted only upon a showing of good cause. (By: JAC)
05/23/2011APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF NO OPPO 8/22/11
06/16/2011ORD GRANT APLT MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF and appellant's brief and the limited appendix shall be filed on or before August 22, 2011. No further requests for extensions of time will be granted absent a showing of good cause. (By: ETW)
08/22/2011FiledMotion For Extension Of Time to File Appendix, Brief 90 Days (Appellant)Granted
09/08/2011FiledGRANT - Order Granting appellant's motion to the extent that the brief and limited appendix shall be filed by November 14, 2011
09/21/2011FiledMotion To Stay Appeal- (Titled: motion to stay briefing schedule pending resolution of a statement of proceedings pursuant to rule 10(c) ) (Appellant)Granted
10/07/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's Motion To Stay Appeal
11/22/2011FiledMotion To Remand (Appellant)Granted
12/05/2011FiledAnswer/Response - concurs with aplt's motion to remand (Appellee)
12/16/2011FiledOrder Granting appellant's motion to remand and the Clerk shall issue the mandate forthwith
12/16/2011FiledRemanded
12/21/2011FiledMandate