judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-96-00870-CR
04-96-00870-CR
10/28/1996
Assault or Attempted Murder
Benito Trevino
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/05/2001Letter of Inquiry Filed
01/02/2001Information regarding cause received
05/01/1997Mandate Executed By The Trial Court
04/29/1997Mandate Issued
04/29/1997Mandate Issued
02/28/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
02/28/1997Motion for Dismissal DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
02/28/1997Opinion issuedDismissed
02/26/1997Staff Attorney has been assigned to the case
02/12/1997Verification Filed
02/10/1997Motion to Withdraw Appeal DisposedAbated
01/30/1997No Description Available.
01/30/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
01/30/1997Continuation of Information from previous event
01/30/1997No Description Available.
01/30/1997No Description Available.
01/29/1997Motion to Withdraw Appeal Filed
11/01/1996Motion for New Trial Filed
10/28/1996Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
10/23/1996Notice of Appeal Filed
10/02/1996Date of Sentencing in Trial Court
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/29/1997Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Unknown UserCriminal - State of TexasSteven C. Hilbig
Benito TrevinoCriminal - AppellantRichard E. Langlois
Trial Court Information
226th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Sid L. Harle
95-CR-4407
Forty (40) Years.