judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 4th Court Of Appeals

Case: 04-82-00067-CR
04-82-00067-CR
02/11/1982
Other Felony
Ex Parte: Ernest B. Ceja
Texas, The State of
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
07/14/2014Case file was destroyed per retention schedule
04/21/1982Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Denied
04/21/1982Motion to Reinstate DisposedMotion or Writ Denied
04/21/1982Opinion issuedMotion or Writ Denied
04/01/1982Submitted
04/01/1982Submission
04/01/1982Submission
04/01/1982Submitted
03/24/1982Motion to Reinstate Filed
03/24/1982Appeal Reinstated
03/10/1982Order EnteredDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
03/10/1982Motion to Advance DisposedMotion or Writ Granted
03/10/1982Order EnteredDismissed-Want of Jurisdiction
03/03/1982Motion to Correct Record Filed
02/26/1982Motion to Advance Filed
02/16/1982Reply brief filed
02/11/1982Pet. for Writ of Habeas Corpus Filed
02/11/1982Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
07/14/2014Case StoredCase destroyed
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
289th Judicial District Court
Bexar
Honorable Tom Rickhoff
82-W-0034
unknown