Case: 13-21-00171-CV
13-21-00171-CV
06/08/2021
Divorce
Peter Michael Buffa
Elisa Silva Buffa
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/08/2021 | Reporters record filed |
| |||
06/25/2021 | Notice of late docketing statement |
| |||
06/23/2021 | Docketing statement filed | | |||
06/22/2021 | Clerks record filed |
| |||
06/08/2021 | Notice of appeal w/form from trial clerk | | |||
06/08/2021 | Fee paid | | |||
06/08/2021 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||
06/04/2021 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||
05/06/2021 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
08/09/2021 | Status | Appellant brief due |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Buffa, Elisa Silva | Appellee | Hon. John Rigney |
Buffa, Peter Michael | Appellant | Hon. Ronald G. Hole |
Trial Court Information
444th District Court
Cameron
Honorable David Sanchez
2017-DCL-01218
Jessie Salazar