judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals

Case: 05-82-00173-CR
05-82-00173-CR
02/09/1982
Aggravated Robbery
Walter Lee Robinson
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
01/06/1983Brief received - oral argument not requestedPro Se
09/29/1982Supplemental brief filedAppellant
09/17/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
08/17/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/03/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
03/06/1987Letter filed
12/19/1986Letter issued by the court
01/14/1985Letter filed
10/24/1984Letter issued by the court
04/26/1983Motion for rehearing filed
04/20/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/06/1983Brief received - oral argument not requested
09/29/1982Supplemental brief filed
09/17/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
08/17/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
08/12/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/09/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/13/1982Reporters record filed
05/13/1982Clerks record filed
02/09/1982Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/20/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Robinson, Walter LeeCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
292nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 292nd District Court
F81-30855-IV
Life TDC