Case: 05-21-00438-CV
05-21-00438-CV
06/11/2021
Damages
Dustin Mitchell
Lacy McCully, Chris Andoe, JaiDa Lynch (Burkett), Lori McCully-Butcher, Stephanie McMurry, Daniel Cardona, and Euclid Media Group
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
07/07/2021 | Response filed |
| |||||
07/07/2021 | No payment arrangements made with court reporter for record |
| |||||
07/07/2021 | Letter filed |
| |||||
06/15/2021 | Statement of inability to afford costs filed in the court of appeals | | |||||
06/15/2021 | Docketing statement filed | ||||||
06/14/2021 | Fee requested |
| |||||
06/14/2021 | Docketing statement due |
| |||||
06/11/2021 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals |
| |||||
06/10/2021 | Motion to reinstate filed | | |||||
06/10/2021 | Notice of appeal filed in trial court | | |||||
06/03/2021 | Judgment signed by trial court judge | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/17/2021 | Status | Compliance response due |
10/01/2021 | Status | Record due to be filed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
OutinSTL Magazine | Appellee | |
Mitchell, Dustin C. | Appellant | Dustin C. Mitchell |
McCully, Lacy | Appellee | Lacy McCully |
McMurry, Stephanie | Appellee | Stephanie McMurry |
McCully-Butcher, Lori | Appellee | Lori McCully-Butcher |
Cardona, Daniel | Appellee | Daniel Cardona |
Lynch (Burkett), JaiDa | Appellee | JaiDa Lynch (Burkett) |
Euclid Media Group, LLC, | Appellee | |
Andoe, Chris | Appellee | Chris Andoe |
Trial Court Information
471st Judicial District Court
Collin
Honorable Andrea K. Bouressa
471-04001-2019
Denise Carrillo